AZ HB2625 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civics celebration day; civics education
Title
Civics celebration day; civics education
Sponsors
Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] |
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 25 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-2-5-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 319 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 710.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |