AZ HB2623 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Fireworks; use; overnight hours; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks; use; overnight hours; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
361606Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75267
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2623p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2623h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.26231217.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2623com.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484168
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485030
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485534
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486649
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75267&billStatusActionId=201729&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75267&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback