AZ HB2620 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Private residential facilities; instructional days

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private residential facilities; instructional days

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-19SenateChapter 178
2023-06-19SenateGovernor Signed
2023-06-13SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-12HouseTransmit to House
2023-06-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2023-06-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-06-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-06-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-06-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-03-21SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2023-03-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2023-03-14SenateSenate read second time
2023-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2023-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2023-03-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-03-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2023-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-14HouseHouse ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0)
2023-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-02-09HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15902.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79472
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2620p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2620h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0178.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.2620PINGERELLI.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.2620EDUCATION.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503891
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504374
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506089
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506546
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509842
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79472&billStatusActionId=216659&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79472&billStatusActionId=216933&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79472&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79472&billStatusActionId=219274&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79472&billStatusActionId=219295&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback