AZ HB2620 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health care workers; assault; prevention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care workers; assault; prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36420New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75261
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2620p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2620h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2620wilmeth.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2620health human services.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482097
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/482957
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484137
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75261&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75261&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75261&billStatusActionId=200583&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75261&billStatusActionId=200626&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback