AZ HB2620 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; prohibited contracts; brokers
Title
Law enforcement; prohibited contracts; brokers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |