AZ HB2618 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (7-53-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (7-53-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fiscal year 2019-2020; general appropriations
Title
Fiscal year 2019-2020; general appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 7 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (7-53-0-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-27 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |