AZ HB2613 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting equipment; requirements; origin
Title
Voting equipment; requirements; origin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-05-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |