AZ HB2613 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sex offender registration; termination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offender registration; termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-12HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133826Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72249
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2613p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2613h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72249&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72249&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72249&billStatusActionId=187164&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72249&billStatusActionId=187434&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72249&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72249&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72249&billStatusActionId=189267&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72249&billStatusActionId=189435&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback