AZ HB2612 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; tribal senior citizens programs
Title
Appropriations; tribal senior citizens programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-21-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |