AZ HB2612 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Veterinarian regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinarian regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Governor Signed
2010-04-21 Transmitted to Governor
2010-04-21 House final reading , voting: (57-3-0-0)
2010-04-21 House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0)
2010-04-20 House minority caucus: Do pass
2010-04-20 House majority caucus: Do pass
2010-04-20 Transmit to House
2010-04-19 Senate third reading , voting: (27-1-2-0)
2010-04-15 Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2010-04-13 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2010-04-13 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2010-04-12 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2010-03-23 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2010-04-05 Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2010-03-24 Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee
2010-03-24 Senate read second time
2010-03-23 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2010-03-23 Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee
2010-03-23 Introduced in Senate and read first time
2010-03-22 Transmit to Senate
2010-03-22 House third reading , voting: (53-5-2-0)
2010-03-04 House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2010-03-02 House majority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-02 House minority caucus: Do pass
2010-03-02 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0)
2010-01-28 Referred to House RULES Committee
2010-02-17 House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2010-02-01 Referred to House COM Committee
2010-02-01 House read second time
2010-01-28 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2010-01-28 Assigned to House COM Committee
2010-01-28 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback