AZ HB2602 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School service providers; information privacy
Title
School service providers; information privacy
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |