AZ HB2601 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Securities; crowdfunding; virtual coin offerings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securities; crowdfunding; virtual coin offerings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 207
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-04-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-8-3-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
441801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
441844Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70840
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2601p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2601h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0207.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2601weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2601commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2601rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70840&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70840&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70840&billStatusActionId=181469&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70840&billStatusActionId=181514&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70840&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70840&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70840&billStatusActionId=182995&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70840&billStatusActionId=183105&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback