AZ HB2599 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative hearings; GRRC
Title
Administrative hearings; GRRC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Chapter 265 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-25 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurs |
2022-05-16 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-16 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-10-3-0) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-15-4-0) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings (s)
Administrative Procedures
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Governor Approval (s)
Governor's Regulatory Review Council (grrc)
Grrc (see Also: Governor's Regulatory Review Council)
Occupational And Professional Licensure (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (s)
Reporting (s)
State Agency Rulemaking (s)
State Government - Title 41
Submission (s)
The Environment - Title 49
Websites (s)
Administrative Procedures
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Governor Approval (s)
Governor's Regulatory Review Council (grrc)
Grrc (see Also: Governor's Regulatory Review Council)
Occupational And Professional Licensure (s)
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (s)
Reporting (s)
State Agency Rulemaking (s)
State Government - Title 41
Submission (s)
The Environment - Title 49
Websites (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4304 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1039 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092.12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |