AZ HB2598 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sanctuary jurisdiction; liability; civil action
Title
Sanctuary jurisdiction; liability; civil action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1052 | New Code | See Bill Text |