AZ HB2596 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

ADOT; telecommunication facilities installation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADOT; telecommunication facilities installation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateChapter 351
2021-05-10SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-05HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2021-05-05HouseHouse concurs
2021-05-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2021-05-05HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2021-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2021-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-15SenateSenate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2021-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate TAT Committee
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-0-8-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287383New CodeSee Bill Text
287384New CodeSee Bill Text
287385New CodeSee Bill Text
287386New CodeSee Bill Text
287387New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75243
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2596p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2596h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2596s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0351.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.25961216.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2596tat.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483428
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484270
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486120
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486939
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487238
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489382
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489465
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75243&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75243&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=200768&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=201311&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=201948&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=201961&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75243&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75243&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=203391&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=203955&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=204010&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75243&billStatusActionId=204011&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback