AZ HB2592 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State emergency council; report; posting
Title
State emergency council; report; posting
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-18 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-5-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |