AZ HB2589 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Assured water supply; analysis; availability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assured water supply; analysis; availability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Motion Representative Martinez motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2589 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2024-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2024-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2024-03-21SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0)
2024-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2024-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2024-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2024-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2024-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2024-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0)
2024-02-22HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-02-22HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2024-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2024-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2024-01-30HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2024-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2024-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2024-01-17HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2024-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45576.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/80450
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2589p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2r/bills/hb2589h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/proposed/H.2589DUNN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/2R/adopted/H.2589NATURAL RESOURCES ENERGY WATER.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/512288
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/513120
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/515648
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/516243
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/517749
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80450&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80450&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80450&billStatusActionId=224102&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80450&billStatusActionId=224127&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80450&billStatusActionId=224134&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=80450&billStatusActionId=224876&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80450&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=80450&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback