AZ HB2589 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DOC officers; personnel system; covered
Title
DOC officers; personnel system; covered
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-4-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Coverage
Doc (see Also: State Department Of Corrections)
State Department Of Corrections (doc)
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel System
Doc (see Also: State Department Of Corrections)
State Department Of Corrections (doc)
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel System
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 742 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |