AZ HB2586 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT dynamic message signs
Title
ADOT dynamic message signs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-03-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-17 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Adot Dynamic Message Signs
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Transportation - Title 28
Adot Dynamic Message Signs
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Transportation - Title 28