AZ HB2585 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

National monuments; justification; litigation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National monuments; justification; litigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 265
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-06 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06HouseHouse final reading , voting: (35-18-7-0)
2016-05-06HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-12SenateTransmit to House
2016-04-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0)
2016-04-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-04-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-15SenateSenate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-03-02HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2016-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0)
2016-02-03HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-17HouseHouse FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-02-04HouseReferred to House FSR Committee
2016-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-03HouseAssigned to House FSR Committee
2016-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2585
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0265.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2585rules.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.2585burges.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.2585fmfr.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.hfsr.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.sfmfr.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2585.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback