AZ HB2580 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County supervisors; jurisdiction; specialized expertise
Title
County supervisors; jurisdiction; specialized expertise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |