AZ HB2579 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1532

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State budget implementation; 2023-2024

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State budget implementation; 2023-2024

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2023-02-01HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-6-0-0-0-0)
2023-01-31HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-31HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2023-01-31HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1532 (Replaces) 2023-02-16 - Governor Vetoed

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/79429
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2579p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2579h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502748
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502861
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503450
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506488
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79429&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=79429&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=79429&billStatusActionId=215049&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback