AZ HB2577 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 213 E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 213 E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Postsecondary distance education; reciprocity agreements
Title
Postsecondary distance education; reciprocity agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 213 E | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-21 | House | House final reading , voting: (54-0-6-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-0-7-0) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |