AZ HB2573 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; laboratory; Navajo technical university

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; laboratory; Navajo technical university

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback