AZ HB2573 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Use fuel dispenser labels; penalties
Title
Use fuel dispenser labels; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-5-2-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-2-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |