AZ HB2570 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Chapter 367
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Licenses; pandemics; revocation prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licenses; pandemics; revocation prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), House Bill 2570 be calendared for Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateChapter 367
2021-05-19SenateGovernor Signed
2021-05-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-05-13HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (31-28-1-0)
2021-05-13HouseHouse concurs
2021-05-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2021-05-13HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2021-05-10HouseTransmit to House
2021-05-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-03-17SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-15HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-11HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
2021-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36787Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75216
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2570p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2570h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2570s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0367.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2570ugenti-rita_1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2570gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2570floorugenti-rita.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483470
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485025
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487035
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487389
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488099
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488907
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489543
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/489613
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=202756&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=202784&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=202824&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=203086&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=203117&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=203120&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=203692&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=204036&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=204059&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75216&billStatusActionId=204065&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback