AZ HB2569 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; private funding; prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; private funding; prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateChapter 199
2021-04-09SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-07HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16407.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75215
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2569p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2569h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0199.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483469
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485024
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486750
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486927
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488759
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488839
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75215&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75215&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75215&billStatusActionId=201827&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75215&billStatusActionId=202533&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75215&billStatusActionId=202541&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75215&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75215&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75215&billStatusActionId=203445&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75215&billStatusActionId=203581&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback