AZ HB2567 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Peace officers; investigator membership requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers; investigator membership requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381117New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75213
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2567p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2567h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484166
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485023
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485762
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487813
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75213&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75213&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75213&billStatusActionId=201611&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75213&billStatusActionId=202775&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75213&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75213&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback