AZ HB2560 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Images; voter lists; records; penalties
Title
Images; voter lists; records; penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Sen. Ken Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2560 substituted for SB 1324. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2560 substituted for SB 1324. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-16 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-05-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2560 substituted for SB 1324. Motion carried. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0) |
2023-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Replaces) 2023-05-15 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Subjects
Ballot Images
Ballot Storage
Cast Vote Record
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Portal
Images
Penalties
Records
Voter Lists
Ballot Storage
Cast Vote Record
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Portal
Images
Penalties
Records
Voter Lists
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 407.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |