AZ HB2559 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Peer-to-peer car sharing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer car sharing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-2-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-16-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425032.03New CodeSee Bill Text
425040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71949
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2559p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2559h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2559grantham.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2559commerce.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2559mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2559fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71949&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71949&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71949&billStatusActionId=187381&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71949&billStatusActionId=188313&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71949&billStatusActionId=188312&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71949&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71949&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback