AZ HB2559 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victims' rights; courtroom posting
Title
Victims' rights; courtroom posting
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-05 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 1:25 PM | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-5-0) | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |