AZ HB2557 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-14-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public land department; establishment; study

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public land department; establishment; study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (12-14-4-0)
2019-05-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House FR Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411293New CodeSee Bill Text
413026.04New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71940
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2557p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2557h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2557s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2557cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2557appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2557gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2557approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2557leach1039.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71940&billStatusActionId=186785&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71940&billStatusActionId=186834&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71940&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71940&billStatusActionId=189729&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71940&billStatusActionId=189782&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback