AZ HB2556 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco; vaping; penalties; legal age
Title
Tobacco; vaping; penalties; legal age
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Criminal Code - Title 13
Exemption
Legal Age
Penalties
Taxation - Title 42
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Vaping
Criminal Code - Title 13
Exemption
Legal Age
Penalties
Taxation - Title 42
Tobacco
Tobacco Products
Vaping
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5014.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5020.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |