AZ HB2553 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-18)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-18)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex trafficking victim; vacating conviction
Title
Sex trafficking victim; vacating conviction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Chapter 219 | |
2015-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |