AZ HB2552 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-12-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal damage; monuments; memorials; statues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal damage; monuments; memorials; statues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-12-3-0)
2021-06-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-06-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-03-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-25SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-28HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131604Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75197
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2552p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2552h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483468
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484266
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487812
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488647
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75197&billStatusActionId=201299&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75197&billStatusActionId=201715&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75197&billStatusActionId=204627&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75197&billStatusActionId=204646&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75197&billStatusActionId=204647&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback