AZ HB2550 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1212

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eyelash technicians; registration..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eyelash technicians; registration..

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Motion HB 2550 substituted for SB 1212. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03SenateChapter 18
2023-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2023-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-03-28HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2023-03-28SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2550 substituted for SB 1212. Motion carried.
2023-03-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-03-07SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2023-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-08HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-01HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-31HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-31HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2023-01-31HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1212 (Replaces) 2023-03-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32519New CodeSee Bill Text
32571Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32574Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78951
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2550p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2550h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0018.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503205
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505359
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/505719
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507632
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508177
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78951&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78951&billStatusActionId=216644&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78951&billStatusActionId=217423&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78951&billStatusActionId=218184&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78951&billStatusActionId=218186&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback