AZ HB2550 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

DHS; long-term care facility surveyors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS; long-term care facility surveyors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-05-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-03-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2020-03-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73231
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2550p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2550h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2550cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2550appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73231&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73231&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73231&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73231&billStatusActionId=194982&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73231&billStatusActionId=195024&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback