AZ HB2550 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulation; kratom products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation; kratom products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateChapter 156
2019-04-30SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-24SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0)
2019-04-24HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-16HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-15HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-03-28SenateSenate NRE Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-20SenateAssigned to Senate NRE Committee
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71883
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2550p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2550h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2550s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0156.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2550gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2550approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2550gowan0901.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71883&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71883&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=188143&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=188449&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=188451&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71883&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71883&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71883&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=188929&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=188962&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=189122&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71883&billStatusActionId=189126&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback