AZ HB2547 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dental hygienists; affiliated practice.
Title
Dental hygienists; affiliated practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 198 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-04-06 | House | House concurs |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Affiliated Practice
Dental Hygienists
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Dental Examiners
Dental Hygienists
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Board Of Dental Examiners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1289.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |