AZ HB2541 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1526

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Environment; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-03HouseHouse read second time
2017-05-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-05-03HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-1-0-0)
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-05-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1526 (Replaces) 2017-05-12 - Chapter 308

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49360Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback