AZ HB2540 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Emotional abuse; vulnerable adults

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emotional abuse; vulnerable adults

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion Representative Longdon moved that HB 2540 be referred to an Additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion Representative Longdon moved that HB 2540 be referred to an Additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0)
2020-02-26HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-25HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2020-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
46451Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73242
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2540p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2540h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73242&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73242&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73242&billStatusActionId=194218&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73242&billStatusActionId=194230&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73242&billStatusActionId=194383&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73242&billStatusActionId=194387&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73242&billStatusActionId=195041&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback