AZ HB2536 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fuel; electric cars; hybrids; taxes
Title
Fuel; electric cars; hybrids; taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. Richard Andrade [D] | Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D] | Rep. Randall Friese [D] |
Sen. Rosanna Gabaldon [D] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5606.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |