AZ HB2529 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Diaper changing stations; public restrooms
Title
Diaper changing stations; public restrooms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |