AZ HB2525 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Barbering; cosmetology; salons; unlicensed employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbering; cosmetology; salons; unlicensed employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05SenateChapter 22
2023-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2023-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
2023-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-03-15SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2023-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2023-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2023-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-03-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-03-01HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2023-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2023-02-08HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2023-01-26HouseHouse read second time
2023-01-25HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-01-25HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32512.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78792
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2525p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/hb2525h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/laws/0022.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/H.2525HENDRIX.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/H.2525REGULATORY AFFAIRS.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503201
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/504968
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506569
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78792&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78792&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78792&billStatusActionId=216871&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78792&billStatusActionId=216957&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78792&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78792&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78792&billStatusActionId=218204&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback