AZ HB2525 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Experienced teacher retention pilot program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Experienced teacher retention pilot program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate HEWD Committee
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71724
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2525p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2525h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2525bolding.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2525bolding2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2525education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2525cobb2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2525appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.25250123.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2525hewd.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71724&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71724&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71724&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71724&billStatusActionId=187952&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71724&billStatusActionId=187963&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71724&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback