AZ HB2524 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Data collection; websites; applications; disclosure
Title
Data collection; websites; applications; disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | House RA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House TECH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |