AZ HB2524 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform firearms transfer compact
Title
Uniform firearms transfer compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |