AZ HB2523 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Youth employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2019-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-01SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-11HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-04HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23230Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23243New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71711
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2523p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2523h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2523pace.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.25230454.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2523rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71711&billStatusActionId=187232&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71711&billStatusActionId=187396&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71711&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback