AZ HB2522 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1143

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Conformity; internal revenue code; rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conformity; internal revenue code; rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-01-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-28HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1143 (Replaced by) 2019-02-01 - Governor Vetoed

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback