AZ HB2521 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Long-term care; health aides
Title
Long-term care; health aides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 86 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-0-1) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Long-term Care System
Health
Health Aides
Long-term Care
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Health
Health Aides
Long-term Care
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1643 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |